Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1194 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 28, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 21, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021