Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1195 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 1, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 23, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 23, 2021
Analysis March 22, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 21, 2021
Fiscal Note April 7, 2021
Fiscal Note March 20, 2021
Fiscal Note March 14, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 13, 2021
Bill March 23, 2021