Senate | 05/03/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Referred to Jurisprudence | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 03/31/2021 | Received from the House | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | Record vote RV#61 | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | Passed | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Record vote RV#53 | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Amended 5-Beckley | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Amended 4-C. Bell | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Amended 3-Wu | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Amended 2-Anchia | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Amended 1-Thierry | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
House | 03/05/2021 | Filed |