Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1225 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 4, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 26, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis April 26, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 27, 2021