Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1228 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/13/2021

                    By: Leman (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 1228
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 12, 2021;
 April 13, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
 Government; May 13, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 13, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the membership of the board of managers for certain
 emergency communication districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 772.306(o), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (o)  In a [an emergency communication] district subject to
 this subchapter located wholly [entirely] in a county with a
 population of less than 40,000 [30,000], the board consists of:
 (1)  the appropriate members listed in Subsection (c);
 and
 (2)  a peace officer licensed under Chapter 1701,
 Occupations Code, appointed by the county sheriff.
 SECTION 2.  The sheriff of a county to which Section
 772.306(o), Health and Safety Code, as amended by this Act, applies
 shall appoint a peace officer to the board of managers as required
 by Section 772.306(o) as soon as practicable after the effective
 date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *