Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1231 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 8, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 19, 2021