|
06/09/2021
|
Effective on 9/1/21
|
|
|
|
06/09/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/29/2021
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2021
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Record vote RV#440
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Amended 1-Ashby, Burrows, and Frullo
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|