Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1278 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2021

                    By: Campos (Senate Sponsor - Bettencourt) H.B. No. 1278
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
 Government; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to public hearings on homelessness issues held by the
 Texas Interagency Council for the Homeless.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2306.907(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The council shall annually [may] hold [, throughout the
 state,] public hearings on homelessness issues in at least one
 county located in a rural area of this state and one county located
 in an urban area of this state.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *