Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1278 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 16, 2021
Fiscal Note April 7, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 15, 2021
Analysis April 22, 2021