Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1280 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 6, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill April 24, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis April 23, 2021