Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1281 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 29, 2021
Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021