Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1293 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 22, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 5, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 1, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 21, 2021