Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1296 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis March 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 10, 2021
Fiscal Note March 14, 2021