Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1306 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill May 5, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 23, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis May 5, 2021