1 | | - | H.B. No. 1315 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: J. Johnson of Harris, Leach, Neave H.B. No. 1315 |
---|
| 2 | + | (Senate Sponsor - Powell) |
---|
| 3 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 21, 2021; |
---|
| 4 | + | May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Health & |
---|
| 5 | + | Human Services; May 24, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 6 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; |
---|
| 7 | + | May 24, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 8 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 9 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1315 By: Perry |
---|
4 | 13 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 14 | | relating to the duration of an appointment of a guardian ad litem or |
---|
6 | 15 | | an attorney ad litem for a child in the conservatorship of the |
---|
7 | 16 | | Department of Family and Protective Services. |
---|
8 | 17 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 18 | | SECTION 1. Section 107.016, Family Code, is amended to read |
---|
10 | 19 | | as follows: |
---|
11 | 20 | | Sec. 107.016. CONTINUED REPRESENTATION; DURATION OF |
---|
12 | 21 | | APPOINTMENT. In a suit filed by a governmental entity in which |
---|
13 | 22 | | termination of the parent-child relationship or appointment of the |
---|
14 | 23 | | entity as conservator of the child is requested: |
---|
15 | 24 | | (1) [an order appointing the Department of Family and |
---|
16 | 25 | | Protective Services as the child's managing conservator may provide |
---|
17 | 26 | | for the continuation of the appointment of the guardian ad litem for |
---|
18 | 27 | | the child for any period during the time the child remains in the |
---|
19 | 28 | | conservatorship of the department, as set by the court; |
---|
20 | 29 | | [(2)] an order appointing the Department of Family and |
---|
21 | 30 | | Protective Services as the child's managing conservator: |
---|
22 | 31 | | (A) shall [may] provide for the continuation of |
---|
23 | 32 | | the appointment of the guardian ad litem or the attorney ad litem |
---|
24 | 33 | | for the child, or an attorney appointed to serve in the dual role, |
---|
25 | 34 | | as long as the child remains in the conservatorship of the |
---|
26 | 35 | | department; and |
---|
27 | 36 | | (B) may provide for the continuation of the |
---|
28 | 37 | | appointment of both the attorney ad litem and the guardian ad litem |
---|
29 | 38 | | for the child if both have been appointed, as long as the child |
---|
30 | 39 | | remains in the conservatorship of the department; and |
---|
31 | 40 | | (2) [(3)] an attorney appointed under this subchapter |
---|
32 | 41 | | to serve as an attorney ad litem for a parent or an alleged father |
---|
33 | 42 | | continues to serve in that capacity until the earliest of: |
---|
34 | 43 | | (A) the date the suit affecting the parent-child |
---|
35 | 44 | | relationship is dismissed; |
---|
36 | 45 | | (B) the date all appeals in relation to any final |
---|
37 | 46 | | order terminating parental rights are exhausted or waived; or |
---|
38 | 47 | | (C) the date the attorney is relieved of the |
---|
39 | 48 | | attorney's duties or replaced by another attorney after a finding |
---|
40 | 49 | | of good cause is rendered by the court on the record. |
---|
41 | 50 | | SECTION 2. The changes in law made by this Act apply to a |
---|
42 | 51 | | suit affecting the parent-child relationship filed before, on, or |
---|
43 | 52 | | after the effective date of this Act. |
---|
44 | 53 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
45 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
46 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
47 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1315 was passed by the House on April |
---|
48 | | - | 21, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 110, Nays 37, 2 present, not |
---|
49 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
50 | | - | No. 1315 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 107, Nays 32, |
---|
51 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
52 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
53 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
54 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1315 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
55 | | - | amendments, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
56 | | - | 0. |
---|
57 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
58 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
59 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
60 | | - | Date |
---|
61 | | - | __________________ |
---|
62 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 54 | + | * * * * * |
---|