1 | | - | H.B. No. 1322 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Shaheen, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 1322 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 14, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 19, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Business & Commerce; May 10, 2021, reported adversely, with |
---|
| 5 | + | favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, |
---|
| 6 | + | Nays 0; May 10, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1322 By: Hancock |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to a summary of a rule proposed by a state agency. |
---|
6 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
7 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Section 2001.023, Government Code, is amended by |
---|
8 | 16 | | adding Subsections (c) and (d) to read as follows: |
---|
9 | 17 | | (c) At the time a state agency files notice of a proposed |
---|
10 | 18 | | rule under Subsection (b), the agency shall publish on the agency's |
---|
11 | 19 | | Internet website a summary of the proposed rule written in plain |
---|
12 | 20 | | language in both English and Spanish in accordance with Section |
---|
13 | 21 | | 2054.116. |
---|
14 | 22 | | (d) For purposes of Subsection (c), a summary is written in |
---|
15 | 23 | | plain language if it uses language the general public, including |
---|
16 | 24 | | individuals with limited English proficiency, can readily |
---|
17 | 25 | | understand because the language is concise and well-organized. |
---|
18 | 26 | | SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only |
---|
19 | 27 | | to a proposed state agency rule for which notice is filed with the |
---|
20 | 28 | | secretary of state under Section 2001.023, Government Code, on or |
---|
21 | 29 | | after the effective date of this Act. |
---|
22 | 30 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
23 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
24 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
25 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1322 was passed by the House on April |
---|
26 | | - | 14, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 149, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
27 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
28 | | - | No. 1322 on May 18, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, |
---|
29 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
30 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
31 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
32 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1322 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
33 | | - | amendments, on May 13, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
34 | | - | 0. |
---|
35 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
36 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
37 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
38 | | - | Date |
---|
39 | | - | __________________ |
---|
40 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 31 | + | * * * * * |
---|