Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB135 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note April 30, 2021
Fiscal Note March 25, 2021
Fiscal Note March 6, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2021
Bill March 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 13, 2021
Analysis April 30, 2021
Analysis March 26, 2021