1 | | - | H.B. No. 1363 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Minjarez (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 1363 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 20, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Business & Commerce; May 4, 2021, reported favorably by the |
---|
| 5 | + | following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 4, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to treatment of a patient by a physical therapist without a |
---|
6 | 12 | | referral. |
---|
7 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Section 453.301(a-2), Occupations Code, is |
---|
9 | 15 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 16 | | (a-2) A physical therapist may treat a patient under |
---|
11 | 17 | | Subsection (a) for not more than 15 consecutive business days if the |
---|
12 | 18 | | physical therapist: |
---|
13 | 19 | | (1) [who] possesses a doctoral degree described by |
---|
14 | 20 | | Subsection (a)(3)(A); and |
---|
15 | 21 | | (2) either: |
---|
16 | 22 | | (A) has completed a residency or fellowship; or |
---|
17 | 23 | | (B) is certified by an entity approved by the |
---|
18 | 24 | | board [may treat a patient under Subsection (a) for not more than 15 |
---|
19 | 25 | | consecutive business days]. |
---|
20 | 26 | | SECTION 2. Not later than November 1, 2021, the Texas Board |
---|
21 | 27 | | of Physical Therapy Examiners shall adopt rules necessary to |
---|
22 | 28 | | implement Section 453.301(a-2), Occupations Code, as amended by |
---|
23 | 29 | | this Act. |
---|
24 | 30 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
25 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
26 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
27 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1363 was passed by the House on April |
---|
28 | | - | 16, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 2, 2 present, not |
---|
29 | | - | voting. |
---|
30 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
31 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
32 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1363 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
33 | | - | 13, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 1. |
---|
34 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
35 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
36 | | - | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
37 | | - | Date |
---|
38 | | - | _____________________ |
---|
39 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 31 | + | * * * * * |
---|