Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB139 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 1, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 21, 2021
Bill March 23, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 20, 2021
Analysis March 23, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 17, 2021
Fiscal Note March 19, 2021
Fiscal Note March 7, 2021