House | 05/12/2021 | Postponed 7/16/22 10:00 AM | ||
House | 05/12/2021 | Laid out as postponed business | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Postponed 5/12/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/23/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/23/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/23/2021 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2021 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | ||
House | 03/05/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 01/27/2021 | Filed |