Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1396 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/27/2021

                    87R3270 MAW/JCG-D
 By: White H.B. No. 1396


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to law enforcement agencies and policies and procedures
 affecting peace officers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 2, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Article 2.1397 to read as follows:
 Art. 2.1397.  DUTIES OF LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCY REGARDING
 PEACE OFFICER MISCONDUCT; DATABASE. (a) In this article:
 (1)  "Commission" means the Texas Commission on Law
 Enforcement.
 (2)  "Law enforcement agency" means an agency of this
 state or an agency of a political subdivision of this state
 authorized by law to employ peace officers.
 (b)  Each law enforcement agency in this state shall report
 to the commission each incident of misconduct by a peace officer
 employed by the agency, including:
 (1)  a conviction for a criminal offense committed in
 the course of performing the officer's duties; or
 (2)  the use of excessive force against a person
 suspected of committing an offense.
 (c)  In reporting an incident of misconduct under Subsection
 (b), the law enforcement agency shall also report whether the
 agency terminated or took disciplinary action against the peace
 officer or permitted the peace officer to retire or resign in lieu
 of termination for the misconduct.
 (d)  The commission shall establish a database for
 information reported to the commission under this article.
 (e)  The commission shall make information in the database
 accessible by all law enforcement agencies in this state.
 (f)  The commission may make information regarding an
 incident of misconduct that is maintained in the database available
 to a federal law enforcement agency that is investigating the
 incident.
 (g)  Information maintained in the database is confidential
 and not subject to disclosure under Chapter 552, Government Code.
 (h)  Not later than March 1 of each year, the commission
 shall make available on its Internet website a report regarding
 incidents of misconduct reported during the preceding calendar
 year. The report must include:
 (1)  the total number of incidents reported to the
 commission under this article during that period; and
 (2)  information regarding:
 (A)  the most common types of misconduct reported;
 and
 (B)  disciplinary action taken by the law
 enforcement agency, including termination or permitting the peace
 officer to retire or resign in lieu of termination.
 (i)  A report under Subsection (h) may not include
 information identifying a specific peace officer.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 772, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 772.0055 to read as follows:
 Sec. 772.0055.  LIMITATION ON ELIGIBILITY FOR GRANT. (a) In
 this section, "law enforcement agency" means an agency of this
 state or an agency of a political subdivision of this state
 authorized by law to employ peace officers.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, to be eligible to receive
 a grant or other discretionary funding by the governor, a law
 enforcement agency must:
 (1)  consistently report incidents of misconduct as
 required by Article 2.1397, Code of Criminal Procedure; and
 (2)  maintain a current certification, issued by a
 credentialing entity designated under Section 1701.165(d),
 Occupations Code, certifying that the agency's policies regarding
 use of force by peace officers:
 (A)  comply with all applicable laws; and
 (B)  prohibit the use of choke holds or other
 physical maneuvers to restrict a person's ability to breathe for
 purpose of incapacitation unless the officer is justified in using
 deadly force against the person.
 (c)  For purposes of Subsection (b)(1), on request, the Texas
 Commission on Law Enforcement shall provide information to the
 governor's office regarding reporting of incidents of misconduct by
 a law enforcement agency.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter D, Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 1701.165 and 1701.166 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 1701.165.  ADVISORY COMMITTEE ON LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCY
 CREDENTIALING ENTITIES. (a) The commission shall establish an
 advisory committee to advise the commission regarding law
 enforcement agency credentialing entities.
 (b)  The advisory committee must include representatives of:
 (1)  municipal and county law enforcement agencies,
 including agencies of varying size and from different areas of this
 state;
 (2)  the Department of Public Safety;
 (3)  the Texas Department of Criminal Justice; and
 (4)  entities that operate correctional facilities
 under contract with a county or the Texas Department of Criminal
 Justice.
 (c)  The advisory committee shall review entities that
 provide credentialing to law enforcement agencies and identify
 credentialing entities that, at a minimum, establish standards and
 processes for reviewing adherence to the standards in the following
 aspects of a law enforcement agency's operations:
 (1)  policies and training regarding use of force and
 de-escalation techniques;
 (2)  performance management tools;
 (3)  procedures to ensure prompt identification of
 peace officers requiring intervention; and
 (4)  best practices regarding community engagement.
 (d)  The commission shall designate, for purposes of
 certifying that the policies of a law enforcement agency comply
 with the requirements of Section 772.0055(b)(2), Government Code,
 one or more of the credentialing entities identified by the
 advisory committee under Subsection (c).
 Sec. 1701.166.  COORDINATED RESPONSE PROGRAM MODEL POLICY.
 (a) In this section, "coordinated response program" means a
 program operated by a law enforcement agency in which a peace
 officer and a mental health professional jointly respond to a
 report of an alleged offense or other incident involving a person
 with a mental impairment, suffering from homelessness, or
 experiencing similar circumstances.
 (b)  The commission, in consultation with the Health and
 Human Services Commission and state and local law enforcement
 agencies, shall develop and make available to all law enforcement
 agencies in this state a model policy and associated training
 materials regarding the operation of a coordinated response
 program.
 (c)  In developing the model policy, the commission shall:
 (1)  survey coordinated response programs implemented
 in this state or another state; and
 (2)  consider the creation of specialized training
 programs for officers and mental health professionals
 participating in a coordinated response program.
 SECTION 4.  (a) Not later than January 1, 2022, the Texas
 Commission on Law Enforcement shall:
 (1)  establish the database required by Article 2.1397,
 Code of Criminal Procedure, as added by this Act;
 (2)  establish the advisory committee required by
 Section 1701.165, Occupations Code, as added by this Act; and
 (3)  develop and make available the model policy and
 associated training materials required by Section 1701.166,
 Occupations Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  Not later than June 1, 2022, the Texas Commission on Law
 Enforcement shall designate one or more credentialing entities as
 required by Section 1701.165, Occupations Code, as added by this
 Act.
 SECTION 5.  Section 772.0055, Government Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to a grant awarded by the office of the
 governor on or after September 1, 2022. A grant awarded before
 September 1, 2022, is governed by the law in effect immediately
 before the effective date of this Act, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.