Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1418 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 14, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 13, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 27, 2021
Fiscal Note March 14, 2021