Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1419 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 13, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 6, 2021
Bill March 31, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 3, 2021
Analysis March 31, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 3, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021
Fiscal Note March 17, 2021