Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1471 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill March 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 24, 2021
Fiscal Note March 15, 2021