Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB149 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/21/2021

                            By: Reynolds, et al. H.B. No. 149
 (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst, Miles)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 149 By:  Powell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study to evaluate state and local regulation of group
 homes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) The Health and Human Services Commission
 shall conduct a study on state and local regulation of group homes.
 (b)  The study must:
 (1)  identify and evaluate state laws relating to the
 regulation of group homes, including:
 (A)  a boarding home facility, as defined by
 Section 260.001, Health and Safety Code; and
 (B)  a community home, described by Chapter 123,
 Human Resources Code;
 (2)  analyze the procedures for filing complaints
 against group homes and make recommendations to expedite complaint
 processes;
 (3)  analyze complaints filed against group homes in
 the preceding 10 years;
 (4)  analyze the enforcement authority over group homes
 granted to state and local governmental agencies, including the
 authority of counties and municipalities to enforce boarding home
 regulations;
 (5)  recommend whether additional state and local
 governmental enforcement authority over group homes is needed;
 (6)  recommend processes to expedite the licensing of
 and regulatory procedures for group homes;
 (7)  determine whether new categories of group homes
 should be licensed or regulated by state or local governmental
 agencies;
 (8)  discuss and recommend methods for identifying
 unlicensed group homes; and
 (9)  evaluate whether Section 260.011, Health and
 Safety Code, which prohibits a county or municipality from
 excluding boarding home facilities from residential areas by zoning
 and similar regulations, prevents certain counties and
 municipalities from regulating boarding home facilities.
 (c)  Not later than December 1, 2022, the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall prepare a written or electronic report
 that includes a summary of the results of the study conducted under
 this section and any legislative recommendations based on the study
 and submit the report to the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker
 of the house of representatives, and members of the standing
 committees of the senate and the house of representatives with
 jurisdiction over the Health and Human Services Commission.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *