Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1493 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/24/2021

                    By: Herrero (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 1493
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
 May 17, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 24, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 24, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1493 By:  Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of an entity name that falsely implies
 governmental affiliation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Title 6, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 150C to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 150C. ENTITY NAME FALSELY IMPLYING GOVERNMENTAL
 AFFILIATION
 Sec. 150C.001.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "governmental
 unit" has the meaning assigned by Section 101.001.
 Sec. 150C.002.  FALSELY IMPLYING GOVERNMENTAL AFFILIATION.
 (a) A governmental unit is entitled to enjoin another person's use
 of an entity name that falsely implies governmental affiliation
 with the governmental unit.
 (b)  In an action brought under this section, the
 governmental unit is entitled to injunctive relief throughout the
 state.
 (c)  If the court finds that the person against whom the
 injunctive relief is sought wilfully intended to imply governmental
 affiliation with the governmental unit, the court, in the court's
 discretion, may award reasonable attorney's fees and court costs to
 the governmental unit.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 5, Business Organizations
 Code, is amended by adding Sections 5.064 and 5.065 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 5.064.  NAME FALSELY IMPLYING GOVERNMENTAL AFFILIATION
 PROHIBITED. (a) A filing entity or a foreign filing entity may not
 use a name in this state that falsely implies an affiliation with a
 governmental entity.
 (b)  The submission of a filing instrument is an affirmation
 by the organizer or by a managerial official named in the filing
 instrument that the name provided as the name of the filing entity
 does not falsely imply an affiliation with a governmental entity.
 (c)  The addition of a word, phrase, or abbreviation that is
 required to be included in the name of a domestic or foreign filing
 entity under the provisions of this chapter is not a factor when
 determining whether a name violates Subsection (a).
 (d)  For purposes of this section, an entity name means:
 (1)  the name of a domestic filing entity, as evidenced
 by its certificate of formation, as amended or restated; or
 (2)  in the case of a foreign filing entity, the name of
 the foreign filing entity or the fictitious name of a foreign filing
 entity, as evidenced by its application for registration or its
 most recent amended registration.
 (e)  The secretary of state shall adopt rules and prescribe
 procedures to implement this section.
 Sec. 5.065.  FALSE IMPLICATION OF GOVERNMENTAL AFFILIATION;
 AUTHORITY OF SECRETARY OF STATE AND ATTORNEY GENERAL. (a) On the
 written request of a governmental entity, the secretary of state
 may, in the secretary's discretion and after consultation with the
 attorney general, determine within two years after the secretary's
 acceptance of a filing instrument that a filing entity's or a
 foreign filing entity's name falsely implies an affiliation with a
 governmental entity in violation of Section 5.064.
 (b)  If the secretary of state determines under Subsection
 (a) that a filing entity's or foreign filing entity's name falsely
 implies an affiliation with a governmental entity, the secretary of
 state shall notify the entity in writing of the need to amend the
 entity's name. Not later than the 60th day after the date the
 secretary of state sends the notification required by this
 subsection, the entity shall:
 (1)  cease transacting business or operating under that
 name in this state; and
 (2)  file with the secretary of state the applicable
 instrument to amend the entity's name as shown in the records of the
 secretary of state.
 (c)  The secretary of state shall provide the filing entity
 or foreign filing entity an opportunity to respond to the notice
 sent under Subsection (b), including through the submission of
 documentation verifying that the filing entity is affiliated with
 the governmental entity.
 (d)  If a filing entity or a foreign filing entity fails to
 take the action required by Subsection (b)(2), the secretary of
 state shall notify the attorney general of the entity's failure to
 file the applicable filing instrument.
 (e)  The attorney general may bring an action in the name of
 the state for injunctive relief to require compliance with this
 section.
 (f)  An action under this section may be brought in a
 district court in Travis County.
 (g)  The attorney general may recover reasonable expenses
 incurred in obtaining injunctive relief under this section,
 including court costs, reasonable attorney's fees, and
 investigatory costs.
 (h)  The secretary of state shall adopt rules and prescribe
 procedures to implement this section.
 (i)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), on the written request
 of a governmental entity, the secretary of state may, in the
 secretary's discretion and after consultation with the attorney
 general, determine within 10 years after the secretary's acceptance
 of a filing instrument that a filing entity's or a foreign filing
 entity's name falsely implies an affiliation with a governmental
 entity in violation of Section 5.064. A determination under this
 subsection is a determination under Subsection (a) for purposes of
 Subsection (b). This subsection expires August 31, 2022.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *