Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1493 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/30/2021

                            H.B. No. 1493


 AN ACT
 relating to the use of an entity name that falsely implies
 governmental affiliation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Title 6, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 150C to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 150C. ENTITY NAME FALSELY IMPLYING GOVERNMENTAL
 AFFILIATION
 Sec. 150C.001.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "governmental
 unit" has the meaning assigned by Section 101.001.
 Sec. 150C.002.  FALSELY IMPLYING GOVERNMENTAL AFFILIATION.
 (a) A governmental unit is entitled to enjoin another person's use
 of an entity name that falsely implies governmental affiliation
 with the governmental unit.
 (b)  In an action brought under this section, the
 governmental unit is entitled to injunctive relief throughout the
 state.
 (c)  If the court finds that the person against whom the
 injunctive relief is sought wilfully intended to imply governmental
 affiliation with the governmental unit, the court, in the court's
 discretion, may award reasonable attorney's fees and court costs to
 the governmental unit.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 5, Business Organizations
 Code, is amended by adding Sections 5.064 and 5.065 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 5.064.  NAME FALSELY IMPLYING GOVERNMENTAL AFFILIATION
 PROHIBITED. (a) A filing entity or a foreign filing entity may not
 use a name in this state that falsely implies an affiliation with a
 governmental entity.
 (b)  The submission of a filing instrument is an affirmation
 by the organizer or by a managerial official named in the filing
 instrument that the name provided as the name of the filing entity
 does not falsely imply an affiliation with a governmental entity.
 (c)  The addition of a word, phrase, or abbreviation that is
 required to be included in the name of a domestic or foreign filing
 entity under the provisions of this chapter is not a factor when
 determining whether a name violates Subsection (a).
 (d)  For purposes of this section, an entity name means:
 (1)  the name of a domestic filing entity, as evidenced
 by its certificate of formation, as amended or restated; or
 (2)  in the case of a foreign filing entity, the name of
 the foreign filing entity or the fictitious name of a foreign filing
 entity, as evidenced by its application for registration or its
 most recent amended registration.
 (e)  The secretary of state shall adopt rules and prescribe
 procedures to implement this section.
 Sec. 5.065.  FALSE IMPLICATION OF GOVERNMENTAL AFFILIATION;
 AUTHORITY OF SECRETARY OF STATE AND ATTORNEY GENERAL. (a) On the
 written request of a governmental entity specifying the basis on
 which a filing entity's or foreign filing entity's name falsely
 implies affiliation with the governmental entity, the secretary of
 state may, in the secretary's reasonable discretion and after
 consultation with the attorney general, determine not later than
 the 30th day after the date of the secretary's acceptance of a
 filing instrument that a filing entity's or a foreign filing
 entity's name falsely implies an affiliation with a governmental
 entity in violation of Section 5.064.
 (b)  If the secretary of state determines under Subsection
 (a) that a filing entity's or foreign filing entity's name falsely
 implies an affiliation with a governmental entity, the secretary of
 state shall notify the entity in writing of the determination. The
 secretary of state shall provide the filing entity or foreign
 filing entity an opportunity to respond to the notice not later than
 the 60th day after the date of the notice, including through the
 submission of documentation verifying that the entity is affiliated
 with the governmental entity or by demonstrating that the entity's
 name does not falsely imply affiliation with the governmental
 entity.  The secretary of state shall make a final determination,
 based on the filing entity's or foreign filing entity's response, as
 to whether or not the entity's name falsely implies an affiliation
 with a governmental entity.
 (c)  After making a final determination based on the filing
 entity's or foreign filing entity's response under Subsection (b),
 the secretary of state shall notify the filing entity or foreign
 filing entity of the secretary's final determination. If the
 entity does not timely respond to notice provided to the entity
 under Subsection (b), the secretary's initial determination
 becomes final.  If the secretary of state finally determines that
 the filing entity's or foreign filing entity's name falsely implies
 an affiliation with a governmental entity, not later than the 90th
 day after the date the secretary of state sends the notification
 required by Subsection (b), the entity shall:
 (1)  cease transacting business or operating under that
 name in this state; and
 (2)  file with the secretary of state the applicable
 instrument to amend the entity's name as shown in the records of the
 secretary of state.
 (d)  If a filing entity or a foreign filing entity fails to
 take the action required by Subsection (c)(2), the secretary of
 state shall notify the attorney general of the entity's failure to
 file the applicable filing instrument.
 (e)  The attorney general may bring an action in the name of
 the state for injunctive relief to require compliance with this
 section.
 (f)  An action under this section may be brought in a
 district court in Travis County.
 (g)  The attorney general may recover reasonable expenses
 incurred in obtaining injunctive relief under this section,
 including court costs, reasonable attorney's fees, and
 investigatory costs.
 (h)  The secretary of state shall adopt rules and prescribe
 procedures to implement this section.
 (i)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), on the written request
 of a governmental entity specifying the basis on which a filing
 entity's or foreign filing entity's name falsely implies
 affiliation with the governmental entity, the secretary of state
 may, in the secretary's reasonable discretion and after
 consultation with the attorney general, determine within eight
 years after the secretary's acceptance of a filing instrument that
 a filing entity's or a foreign filing entity's name falsely implies
 an affiliation with a governmental entity in violation of Section
 5.064. A determination made under this subsection is subject to
 Subsections (b)-(g) to the same extent as a determination made
 under Subsection (a). This subsection expires December 31, 2021.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than December 1, 2021, the secretary of
 state shall adopt rules and prescribe procedures under Section
 5.065(h), Business Organizations Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  The secretary of state and the attorney general
 retain the authority under Section 5.065, Business Organizations
 Code, as added by this Act, to act on a written request by a
 governmental entity under Section 5.065(i), Business Organizations
 Code, as added by this Act, that is made before December 31, 2021.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1493 was passed by the House on April
 30, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 126, Nays 15, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 1493 on May 28, 2021, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 1493 on May 30, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 134,
 Nays 8, 3 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1493 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 1493 on May 30, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor