Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1496 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/14/2021

                    By: VanDeaver (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 1496
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2021;
 May 4, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 14, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0;
 May 14, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1496 By:  Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring school districts to report management fees
 under certain cooperative purchasing contracts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 44.0331(a), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  A school district that enters into a purchasing contract
 valued at $25,000 or more under Section 44.031(a)(5), under
 Subchapter F, Chapter 271, Local Government Code, or under any
 other cooperative purchasing program authorized for school
 districts by law shall document a [any] contract-related fee,
 including a [any] management fee, paid by or to the district and the
 purpose of each fee under the contract.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *