Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1496 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 13, 2021
Fiscal Note May 5, 2021
Fiscal Note March 26, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 13, 2021
Analysis May 5, 2021
Analysis April 9, 2021