|
06/16/2021
|
Effective on 9/1/21
|
|
|
|
06/16/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/29/2021
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2021
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Record vote RV#1122
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Postponed 5/13/21 8:30PM
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|