|
06/16/2021
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
|
06/16/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/01/2021
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2021
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2021
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2021
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2021
|
Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction HCR 117
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2021
|
House adopts resolution for tech. correction HCR 117
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Record vote RV#1792
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2021
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2021
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2021
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2021
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA30 Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA29 Perry
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA28 Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA27 Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA26 Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA25 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA24 Lucio
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA23 Lucio
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA22 West
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment adopted as amended FA20 Hughes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment to amendment offered FA21 Campbell
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA20 Hughes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA19 Buckingham
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA18 Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA17 Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA16 Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA15 Huffman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA14 Lucio
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment adopted as amended FA12 Hughes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment to amendment offered FA13 Hughes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA12 Hughes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA11 West
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA10 Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA9 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA8 Nichols
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA7 West
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA6 Hughes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA5 Campbell
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA4 Campbell
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment adopted as amended FA2 Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment to amendment offered FA3 Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA2 Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2021
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Record vote RV#393
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Amended 2-Guillen
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Amended 1-E. Thompson
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Amended 20-Howard
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 19-Krause
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Amended 18-Bernal
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 17-Bailes
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 16-Guillen
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Record vote RV#387
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Amendment adopted as amended 14-C. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Amendment amended 15-C. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 14-C. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 13-Guillen
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Amended 12-Howard
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Amended 11-Dean
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Amended 10-Bailes
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Amended 9-Raymond
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Amended 8-VanDeaver
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Amended 7-VanDeaver and Rogers
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Amended 6-Guillen
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Amended 5-Raymond
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 4-Guillen
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Amended 3-Huberty
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Amended 2-Huberty
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Amended 1-Huberty
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
Record vote RV#294
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
Calendars Committee rule adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|