Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1544 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 13, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 14, 2021
Fiscal Note May 11, 2021
Fiscal Note April 23, 2021
Fiscal Note March 22, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis April 21, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021