House | 05/12/2021 | Postponed 6/3/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 05/12/2021 | Laid out as postponed business | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | Postponed 5/12/21 11:00 AM | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Corrected committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Corrected comm. report distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Filed |