Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1560 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 30, 2021
Fiscal Note May 22, 2021
Fiscal Note May 14, 2021
Fiscal Note April 16, 2021
Fiscal Note March 31, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill April 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis May 15, 2021
Analysis April 20, 2021