Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1565 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021
Bill April 13, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 10, 2021
Fiscal Note March 16, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis April 13, 2021