Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1577 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 4, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 23, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 22, 2021
Fiscal Note March 28, 2021