Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB159 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill May 4, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 11, 2021
Fiscal Note March 15, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis April 1, 2021