Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1601 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 87R2121 SMT-D
22 By: Allison H.B. No. 1601
33
44
55 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
66 AN ACT
77 relating to a local option exemption from ad valorem taxation of all
88 or part of the appraised value of the residence homesteads of
99 certain peace officers.
1010 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1111 SECTION 1. Section 11.13(i), Tax Code, is amended to read as
1212 follows:
1313 (i) The assessor and collector for a taxing unit may
1414 disregard the exemptions authorized by Subsection (b), (c), (d),
1515 [or] (n), or (s) [of this section] and assess and collect a tax
1616 pledged for payment of debt without deducting the amount of the
1717 exemption if:
1818 (1) prior to adoption of the exemption, the taxing
1919 unit pledged the taxes for the payment of a debt; and
2020 (2) granting the exemption would impair the obligation
2121 of the contract creating the debt.
2222 SECTION 2. Section 11.13(m), Tax Code, is amended by adding
2323 Subdivisions (1-a) and (1-b) to read as follows:
2424 (1-a) "Eligible peace officer" means an individual
2525 listed under Article 2.12(1), (2), (3), or (4), Code of Criminal
2626 Procedure, who is employed full-time as a peace officer by this
2727 state or by a political subdivision of this state.
2828 (1-b) "High-need area" means an area designated by the
2929 governing body of a taxing unit that the governing body determines
3030 is likely to benefit from a greater number of peace officers
3131 residing in the area.
3232 SECTION 3. Section 11.13, Tax Code, is amended by adding
3333 Subsections (s) and (t) to read as follows:
3434 (s) In addition to any other exemptions provided by this
3535 section, an eligible peace officer is entitled to an exemption from
3636 taxation by a taxing unit of all or part of the appraised value of
3737 the peace officer's residence homestead if:
3838 (1) the exemption is adopted by the governing body of
3939 the taxing unit in the manner required by law for official action by
4040 the governing body; and
4141 (2) the peace officer's residence homestead is located
4242 in an area designated as a high-need area by the governing body of
4343 the taxing unit.
4444 (t) The governing body of a taxing unit may adopt the
4545 exemption provided by Subsection (s) as a specified dollar amount
4646 or as a percentage of the appraised value of the property.
4747 SECTION 4. Section 403.302(d), Government Code, is amended
4848 to read as follows:
4949 (d) For the purposes of this section, "taxable value" means
5050 the market value of all taxable property less:
5151 (1) the total dollar amount of any residence homestead
5252 exemptions lawfully granted under Section 11.13(b), [or] (c), or
5353 (s), Tax Code, in the year that is the subject of the study for each
5454 school district;
5555 (2) one-half of the total dollar amount of any
5656 residence homestead exemptions granted under Section 11.13(n), Tax
5757 Code, in the year that is the subject of the study for each school
5858 district;
5959 (3) the total dollar amount of any exemptions granted
6060 before May 31, 1993, within a reinvestment zone under agreements
6161 authorized by Chapter 312, Tax Code;
6262 (4) subject to Subsection (e), the total dollar amount
6363 of any captured appraised value of property that:
6464 (A) is within a reinvestment zone created on or
6565 before May 31, 1999, or is proposed to be included within the
6666 boundaries of a reinvestment zone as the boundaries of the zone and
6767 the proposed portion of tax increment paid into the tax increment
6868 fund by a school district are described in a written notification
6969 provided by the municipality or the board of directors of the zone
7070 to the governing bodies of the other taxing units in the manner
7171 provided by former Section 311.003(e), Tax Code, before May 31,
7272 1999, and within the boundaries of the zone as those boundaries
7373 existed on September 1, 1999, including subsequent improvements to
7474 the property regardless of when made;
7575 (B) generates taxes paid into a tax increment
7676 fund created under Chapter 311, Tax Code, under a reinvestment zone
7777 financing plan approved under Section 311.011(d), Tax Code, on or
7878 before September 1, 1999; and
7979 (C) is eligible for tax increment financing under
8080 Chapter 311, Tax Code;
8181 (5) the total dollar amount of any captured appraised
8282 value of property that:
8383 (A) is within a reinvestment zone:
8484 (i) created on or before December 31, 2008,
8585 by a municipality with a population of less than 18,000; and
8686 (ii) the project plan for which includes
8787 the alteration, remodeling, repair, or reconstruction of a
8888 structure that is included on the National Register of Historic
8989 Places and requires that a portion of the tax increment of the zone
9090 be used for the improvement or construction of related facilities
9191 or for affordable housing;
9292 (B) generates school district taxes that are paid
9393 into a tax increment fund created under Chapter 311, Tax Code; and
9494 (C) is eligible for tax increment financing under
9595 Chapter 311, Tax Code;
9696 (6) the total dollar amount of any exemptions granted
9797 under Section 11.251 or 11.253, Tax Code;
9898 (7) the difference between the comptroller's estimate
9999 of the market value and the productivity value of land that
100100 qualifies for appraisal on the basis of its productive capacity,
101101 except that the productivity value estimated by the comptroller may
102102 not exceed the fair market value of the land;
103103 (8) the portion of the appraised value of residence
104104 homesteads of individuals who receive a tax limitation under
105105 Section 11.26, Tax Code, on which school district taxes are not
106106 imposed in the year that is the subject of the study, calculated as
107107 if the residence homesteads were appraised at the full value
108108 required by law;
109109 (9) a portion of the market value of property not
110110 otherwise fully taxable by the district at market value because of
111111 action required by statute or the constitution of this state, other
112112 than Section 11.311, Tax Code, that, if the tax rate adopted by the
113113 district is applied to it, produces an amount equal to the
114114 difference between the tax that the district would have imposed on
115115 the property if the property were fully taxable at market value and
116116 the tax that the district is actually authorized to impose on the
117117 property, if this subsection does not otherwise require that
118118 portion to be deducted;
119119 (10) the market value of all tangible personal
120120 property, other than manufactured homes, owned by a family or
121121 individual and not held or used for the production of income;
122122 (11) the appraised value of property the collection of
123123 delinquent taxes on which is deferred under Section 33.06, Tax
124124 Code;
125125 (12) the portion of the appraised value of property
126126 the collection of delinquent taxes on which is deferred under
127127 Section 33.065, Tax Code;
128128 (13) the amount by which the market value of a
129129 residence homestead to which Section 23.23, Tax Code, applies
130130 exceeds the appraised value of that property as calculated under
131131 that section; and
132132 (14) the total dollar amount of any exemptions granted
133133 under Section 11.35, Tax Code.
134134 SECTION 5. This Act applies only to ad valorem taxes imposed
135135 for a tax year that begins on or after the effective date of this
136136 Act.
137137 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect January 1, 2022, but only
138138 if the constitutional amendment proposed by the 87th Legislature,
139139 Regular Session, 2021, authorizing a local option exemption from ad
140140 valorem taxation of all or part of the appraised value of the
141141 residence homesteads of certain peace officers is approved by the
142142 voters. If that amendment is not approved by the voters, this Act
143143 has no effect.