Senate | 05/17/2021 | Referred to Jurisprudence | ||
Senate | 05/17/2021 | Received from the House | ||
Senate | 05/17/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 05/16/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/14/2021 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/14/2021 | Record vote RV#1184 | ||
House | 05/14/2021 | Passed | ||
House | 05/14/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/13/2021 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 05/13/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/12/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues | ||
House | 11/09/2020 | Filed |