House | 04/30/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/09/2021 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/09/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/09/2021 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | ||
House | 04/09/2021 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 02/08/2021 | Filed |