Senate | 05/18/2021 | Referred to Jurisprudence | ||
Senate | 05/18/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/09/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Record vote RV#130 | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Passed as amended | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Amended 2-Vasut | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Postponed | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Laid out as postponed business | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Postponed 4/8/21 11:20 AM | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Point of order withdrawn Rule 8, Section 1(a)(1) | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Amended 1-Schaefer | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Record vote RV#103 | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2) | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/17/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | ||
House | 11/09/2020 | Filed |