Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1683 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 19, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 16, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 14, 2021
Fiscal Note March 20, 2021