Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1693 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 4, 2021
Analysis April 14, 2021