Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB17 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 5, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 31, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 23, 2021
Analysis March 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 19, 2021
Bill March 23, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 19, 2021
Fiscal Note March 19, 2021
Fiscal Note March 18, 2021