Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1701 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/09/2021

                            87R5962 SMT-D
 By: Price H.B. No. 1701


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to pricing of and health benefit plan cost-sharing
 requirements for prescription insulin.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1358.054(b), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  Except as provided by Section 1358.103(c), a [A] health
 benefit plan may require a deductible, copayment, or coinsurance
 for coverage provided under this section. The amount of the
 deductible, copayment, or coinsurance may not exceed the amount of
 the deductible, copayment, or coinsurance required for treatment of
 other analogous chronic medical conditions.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 1358, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter C to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER C. COST-SHARING LIMIT
 Sec. 1358.101.  APPLICABILITY OF SUBCHAPTER. (a) This
 subchapter applies only to a health benefit plan that provides
 benefits for medical or surgical expenses incurred as a result of a
 health condition, accident, or sickness, including an individual,
 group, blanket, or franchise insurance policy or insurance
 agreement, a group hospital service contract, or a small or large
 employer group contract or similar coverage document that is
 offered by:
 (1)  an insurance company;
 (2)  a group hospital service corporation operating
 under Chapter 842;
 (3)  a fraternal benefit society operating under
 Chapter 885;
 (4)  a stipulated premium company operating under
 Chapter 884;
 (5)  a reciprocal exchange operating under Chapter 942;
 (6)  a health maintenance organization operating under
 Chapter 843;
 (7)  a multiple employer welfare arrangement that holds
 a certificate of authority under Chapter 846; or
 (8)  an approved nonprofit health corporation that
 holds a certificate of authority under Chapter 844.
 (b)  This subchapter applies to group health coverage made
 available by a school district in accordance with Section 22.004,
 Education Code.
 (c)  Notwithstanding any provision in Chapter 1551, 1575,
 1579, or 1601 or any other law, this subchapter applies to:
 (1)  a basic coverage plan under Chapter 1551;
 (2)  a basic plan under Chapter 1575;
 (3)  a primary care coverage plan under Chapter 1579;
 and
 (4)  basic coverage under Chapter 1601.
 Sec. 1358.102.  EXCEPTION. This subchapter does not apply
 to:
 (1)  a health benefit plan that provides coverage:
 (A)  only for a specified disease or for another
 single benefit;
 (B)  only for accidental death or dismemberment;
 (C)  for wages or payments in lieu of wages for a
 period during which an employee is absent from work because of
 sickness or injury;
 (D)  as a supplement to a liability insurance
 policy;
 (E)  for credit insurance;
 (F)  only for dental or vision care;
 (G)  only for hospital expenses; or
 (H)  only for indemnity for hospital confinement;
 (2)  a Medicare supplemental policy as defined by
 Section 1882(g)(1), Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. Section 1395ss);
 (3)  medical payment insurance coverage provided under
 a motor vehicle insurance policy;
 (4)  a long-term care insurance policy, including a
 nursing home fixed indemnity policy, unless the commissioner
 determines that the policy provides benefit coverage so
 comprehensive that the policy is a health benefit plan as described
 by Section 1358.101;
 (5)  health and accident coverage provided by a risk
 pool created under Chapter 172, Local Government Code; or
 (6)  a workers' compensation insurance policy.
 Sec. 1358.103.  LIMIT ON COST-SHARING REQUIREMENT. (a) In
 this section, "insulin" means a prescription drug that contains
 insulin, is used to treat diabetes, and is prescribed as medically
 necessary by a physician.
 (b)  A health benefit plan that provides coverage for insulin
 may not impose a cost-sharing provision for insulin if the total
 amount the enrollee is required to pay exceeds $30 for a 30-day
 supply, regardless of the amounts, types, or brands of insulin
 needed to treat the enrollee's diabetes.
 (c)  A health benefit plan that provides coverage for insulin
 may not impose a deductible applicable to insulin.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  In this section, "commission" means the
 Health and Human Services Commission.
 (b)  The commission shall conduct a study evaluating pricing
 of prescription insulin drugs to ensure adequate consumer
 protections in pricing of prescription insulin drugs and consider
 whether additional consumer protections are necessary.
 (c)  The commission shall request from health benefit plan
 issuers and prescription drug manufacturers information concerning
 the organization, business practices, pricing information, data,
 reports, or other information the commission determines is
 necessary to conduct the study.  The commission shall also consider
 any publicly available information related to prescription insulin
 pricing.
 (d)  A health benefit plan issuer or prescription drug
 manufacturer who receives a request from the commission under
 Subsection (c) of this section shall furnish the commission with
 the information as soon as practicable after the date the issuer or
 manufacturer receives the request.
 (e)  The commission may not require a health benefit plan
 issuer or prescription drug manufacturer to disclose trade secrets
 in information provided to the commission under Subsection (d) of
 this section.
 (f)  Not later than September 1, 2022, the commission shall
 prepare and submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, and
 the speaker of the house of representatives a written report
 containing the results of the study. The report must include:
 (1)  a summary of insulin pricing practices and
 variables that contribute to pricing of health benefit plans;
 (2)  policy recommendations to control and prevent
 overpricing of prescription insulin; and
 (3)  any other information the commission determines is
 necessary.
 (g)  The commission shall publish the report described by
 Subsection (f) of this section on its Internet website.
 (h)  This section expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 4.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a health benefit plan that is delivered, issued for delivery, or
 renewed on or after January 1, 2022. A health benefit plan
 delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed before January 1, 2022,
 is governed by the law as it existed immediately before the
 effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.