Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1739 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 4, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021
Bill April 9, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note May 13, 2021
Fiscal Note April 8, 2021
Fiscal Note March 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis May 12, 2021
Analysis April 9, 2021