Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1753 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 16, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 15, 2021
Analysis April 14, 2021