Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1755 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 30, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 23, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 16, 2021
Analysis March 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 15, 2021
Fiscal Note March 22, 2021