Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1763 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 13, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2021
Bill April 15, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 6, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 6, 2021
Analysis April 14, 2021