Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB18 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 15, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 23, 2021
Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note May 11, 2021
Fiscal Note April 9, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill April 12, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis April 9, 2021